Vedic Mathematics is a set of vedic maths tricks and techniques used to solve mathematical problems easily. You can solve complex problems in seconds by using these tricks.
History of Vedic Maths
The first book of Vedic Mathematics was published in 1965.
It is written by an Indian monk named Bharati Krishna Tirth. Shankaracharya Bharati Krishna Tirth was a genius mathematician.
He discovered the system of vedic maths between A.D 1911 to 1918. Vedic maths consists of 12 sutras (formulae) and 13 sub-sutras.
Before moving on to the tricks, let us know what are the benefits of using vedic maths tricks.
You don’t have to memorize difficult formulas to solve math problems.
Vedic maths tricks are easier to memorize than the traditional formulas and concepts.
Practice will make you better at it. Hence, no worry about memorizing long formulae.
Vedic maths will increase your problem solving speed
With these tricks, you can increase your speed. During exams, time is very crucial.Hence, you may lose time remembering a formula. Vedic math helps save time.
When you solve it right, your motivation increases and you become more focused.Confidence plays a great role in the exam hall. If you get confused in one sum, you may lose focus.
Therefore, using these tricks will help you correctly solve the sums. It will increase your motivation.
There’s least probability of making silly mistakes
Most of you may be losing marks just because of silly mistakes. Vedic maths tricks are simple. You can remember them easily. Hence, no silly mistakes.
You can make intelligent decisions while solving complex problems
Vedic math is helpful to solve simple as well as complex math problems.You can use these tricks to solve problems in olympiad and other competitive exams as well.
Here is a list of 10 simple yet efficient vedic maths tricks.
Steps to square a number with its last digit as 5
This vedic maths trick is simple. It helps you square a 2-digit number which has 5 in the one’s place.
Multiply the 1st digit with 1 and then, write 25 at the end.
For example: (65) ² =?
Step 1: 65 x 65 = …….25 (at the end)
Step 2: 6 x (6+1) = 6 x 7 = 42
Hence, the answer is 4225.
Steps to subtract a number from 1000, 10000, 100000 and so on
This math trick is useful to get accurate subtracted results from 1000, 10000, 100000 and so on.
The simple formula is – Subtract all the digits from 9 and last digit from 10.
For example: 1000 – 786=?
We will subtract each digit in 876 from 9 and the last digit from 10.
Step 1 : 9 – 7 = 2
Step 2 : 9 – 8 = 1
Step 3 : 10 – 6 = 4
Therefore, the answer is 1000 – 786= 214
Steps to divide a large number by 5
Use this trick to divide a large number by 5 and get accurate results.There are only two steps to follow.
First, multiplying the number by 2 and second ,removing digits after decimal point.
For example: 2129 / 5 =?
Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258
Step 2: Moving the decimal: 425.8 or 425
Steps to multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11
This vedic maths trick helps in easy multiplication in seconds. Let us see how it works.
22 x 11
22 * 11 = 2 (2+2) 2 = 242
Hence, the answer is: 22 * 11 =242
52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572
Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.
Steps to multiply any 3-digit numbers
Lets us multiply these 2 numbers: 306 and 308
Step 1: Subtract the digit in the unit’s place from the actual number.
Step 2 : Select any number and add the unit digit of the other number
Step 3 : Now, multiply the result obtained in last 2 steps; 314×300 = 94200
Step 4 : Both the numbers have 8 and 6 in the unit’s place.
The product of these two numbers: 8×6=48
Step 5 : 94200 + 48 = 94248
Hence, the final answer of 306 x 308 = 306 is 94248
You can try out the process with the following numbers – 808*206, 536*504, 408*416.
Steps to find the Square Value
Vedic maths tricks help obtain the square value quick and easy.
Let us see the steps involved:
Step 1.Choose a base near to the original number.
Step 2. Find the difference between the original number and base.
Step 3. Add the difference to the original number.
Step 4. Multiply the result with the base.
Step 5. Take the product of the square of the difference. Add it with the result of the above point.
For example : (98) ² =?
Step 1: Choose 100 as base
Step 2: Difference: 98-100 = -2
Step 3: Add the number with the difference that you got in Step 2 = 98 + (-2) = 96
Step 4: Multiplying result with base = 96*100 = 9700
Step 5: Now, add result with the square of the difference= 9600 + (-2)² = 9604
So our answer is : (98) ² = 9604
You can practice with (99)², (97)², (102)², (101)².
These were a few simple vedic maths tricks to help you.
Vedic maths is also reliable for students appearing for competitive examinations. Vedic math helps you save a lot of time and effort.
Also, various kinds of sums can be solved with one vedic math trick.
These tricks make you efficient and many times faster.
If you want to ace the aptitude section of a competitive exam, then you should learn vedic maths.
One more major benefit is that you will not be dependent on a calculator.
Because you will be able to solve problems with large numbers easily using vedic math.
So, if you’re someone who is preparing for different olympiads or competitive exams, then you must start learning vedic maths. It will make your life much easier.
Learn more skills such as financial skills, language skills, music , dance, etc on Wizaru. Start learning today!
Hope these vedic maths tricks help you.